Multiplication of three digit numbers with 2 digit numbers: Sheet # 1 - Multiplication Worksheet

* Please answer all the questions before submitting the worksheet
 GO BACK
Name : .....................................
Grade : .........................
iPracticeMath
Q. 1 391 X 52

Q. 2 645 X 39

Q. 3 865 X 54

Q. 4 825 X 39

Q. 5 599 X 45

Q. 6 814 X 43



Answer :
Q 1) 391 X 52
Ans) 20332 .
Q 2) 645 X 39
Ans) 25155 .
Q 3) 865 X 54
Ans) 46710 .
Q 4) 825 X 39
Ans) 32175 .
Q 5) 599 X 45
Ans) 26955 .
Q 6) 814 X 43
Ans) 35002 .
Previous Worksheet Next Worksheet
 GO BACK